IA SF2374 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restitution ordered in a criminal proceeding, court debt, and civil claims for reimbursement against inmates, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2244.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to restitution ordered in a criminal proceeding, court debt, and civil claims for reimbursement against inmates, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2244.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee: Klein, Hagenow and Wolfe. H.J. 538. |
2020-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 572. |
2020-03-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 536. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 559. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 16. S.J. 559. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5073 filed, adopted. S.J. 558. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 400. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 393. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2244 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2374. S.J. 400.