IA SF2374 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: After morning debate,following sub on SF 2377 House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: After morning debate,following sub on SF 2377 House Lounge.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (Formerly SSB 3154.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (Formerly SSB 3154.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: After morning debate,following sub on SF 2377 House Lounge. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Heartsill and Wolfe. H.J. 589. |
2018-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 570. |
2018-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 568. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 631. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 33, nays 16. S.J. 628. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 401. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 395. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3154 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.