IA SF2368 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Message from Senate. H.J. 893.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Message from Senate. H.J. 893.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying provisions related to the sale of real property by school districts, charter school and open enrollment funding, and the participation in school activities by students enrolled in charter schools. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying provisions related to the sale of real property by school districts, charter school and open enrollment funding, and the participation in school activities by students enrolled in charter schools. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 893. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 927. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 15. S.J. 926. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5221. S.J. 926. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5221. S.J. 909. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 38. H.J. 890. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8378 filed, adopted. H.J. 890. |
2024-04-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 877. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 876. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 907. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 15. S.J. 907. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5165 out of order. S.J. 907. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5202 adopted, as amended. S.J. 906. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5209 to S-5202 filed, adopted. S.J. 906. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5202 filed. S.J. 896. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5165 filed. S.J. 854. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 312. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3157 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2368.
HSB673 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2543.
HF2543 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
HSB673 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2543.
HF2543 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.