IA SF2365 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Amendment H-8388 filed.
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Amendment H-8388 filed.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to assistance animals and service animals in housing and misrepresentation of an animal as a service animal or a service-animal-in-training and providing penalties and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3148.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to assistance animals and service animals in housing and misrepresentation of an animal as a service animal or a service-animal-in-training and providing penalties and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3148.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8388 filed. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 591. |
2018-03-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Gaines and Zumbach. H.J. 549. |
2018-03-08 | House | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 521. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 588. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 581. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-5124 filed, adopted. S.J. 581. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 403. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3148 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2365 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/March%2007,%202018.pdf |