IA SF2363 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Education. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Education. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Summary
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial licensure. (Formerly SSB 3194.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial licensure. (Formerly SSB 3194.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 693. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 398. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 393. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3194 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2018 5:00PM RM 223
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2363 |