IA SF2362 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing requirements relating to the use and identification of open educational resources by postsecondary educational institutions. (Formerly SSB 3179.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing requirements relating to the use and identification of open educational resources by postsecondary educational institutions. (Formerly SSB 3179.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Gassman and Mascher. H.J. 549. |
2018-03-08 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 520. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 495. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 579. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 579. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-5105 out of order. S.J. 578. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-5123 filed, adopted. S.J. 578. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5105 filed. S.J. 568. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 398. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 393. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3179 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.