IA SF2361 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to academic programs of regents institutions. (Formerly SF 2191.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to academic programs of regents institutions. (Formerly SF 2191.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseFiscal note.
2018-03-08HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 520.
2018-03-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 513.
2018-03-07SenateImmediate message. S.J. 588.
2018-03-07SenatePassed Senate, ayes 39, nays 10. S.J. 584.
2018-03-07SenateAmendment S-5088 adopted. S.J. 583.
2018-03-06SenateFiscal note.
2018-03-05SenateAmendment S-5088 filed. S.J. 535.
2018-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 397.
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 393.

Same As/Similar To

SF2191 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback