IA SF236 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public safety including the Iowa law enforcement academy council, the state fire service and emergency response council, the state building code commissioner, fingerprint records, disposition records, the sex offender registry, and access to deferred judgment docket records. (Formerly SSB 1072.) Effective 7-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public safety including the Iowa law enforcement academy council, the state fire service and emergency response council, the state building code commissioner, fingerprint records, disposition records, the sex offender registry, and access to deferred judgment docket records. (Formerly SSB 1072.) Effective 7-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1083. | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1066. | |
2011-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1066. | |
2011-04-20 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1083. | |
2011-04-19 | Immediate message. S.J. 1018. | |
2011-04-19 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 1018. | |
2011-04-19 | Senate concurred with S-3258. S.J. 1018. | |
2011-04-13 | Message from House, with amendment S-3258. S.J. 986. | |
2011-04-13 | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 1033. | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment H-1584 withdrawn. H.J. 1033. | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment H-1654 filed, adopted. H.J. 1033. | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 983. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment H-1584 filed. H.J. 954. | |
2011-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 810. | |
2011-03-18 | Subcommittee, Hagenow, Baudler, and Berry. H.J. 721. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 585. | |
2011-03-08 | Message from Senate. H.J. 562. | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate message. S.J. 533. | |
2011-03-08 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 532. | |
2011-02-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 313. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 309. |