IA SF2356 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Subcommittee, Windschitl, Kelley, and Sands. H.J. 800.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Subcommittee, Windschitl, Kelley, and Sands. H.J. 800.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales tax the purchase price of tangible personal property sold and services furnished to a nonprofit food bank. (Formerly SF 2323.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales tax the purchase price of tangible personal property sold and services furnished to a nonprofit food bank. (Formerly SF 2323.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Kelley, and Sands. H.J. 800. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 791. |
2014-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 786. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 837. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 832. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 806. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 805. |