IA SF2342 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state taxation by providing specified tax credits for the construction and installation of solar energy systems and geothermal heat pumps, modifying sales and use tax provisions related to property purchased for resale, and creating a sales tax exemption for certain items purchased for use in providing vehicle wash and wax services and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3204.) Effective 5-25-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state taxation by providing specified tax credits for the construction and installation of solar energy systems and geothermal heat pumps, modifying sales and use tax provisions related to property purchased for resale, and creating a sales tax exemption for certain items purchased for use in providing vehicle wash and wax services and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3204.) Effective 5-25-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 950. | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 949. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 949. | |
2012-05-07 | Message from House. S.J. 899. | |
2012-05-07 | Immediate message. H.J. 913. | |
2012-05-08 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 941. | |
2012-05-07 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 927. | |
2012-05-07 | Passed House, ayes 82, nays 14. H.J. 912. | |
2012-05-07 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 912. | |
2012-05-07 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 912. | |
2012-04-30 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-04-27 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 893. | |
2012-04-26 | Message from Senate. H.J. 892. | |
2012-04-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 866. | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 1. S.J. 864. | |
2012-04-26 | Amendment S-5235 filed, adopted. S.J. 864. | |
2012-04-26 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 863. | |
2012-04-26 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 862. |