IA SF2340 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act extending the period for determining the rates of the motor fuel tax based on calculating the distribution of ethanol blended gasoline and other motor fuel, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act extending the period for determining the rates of the motor fuel tax based on calculating the distribution of ethanol blended gasoline and other motor fuel, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-04-26 | Withdrawn. S.J. 865. | |
2012-04-26 | House File 2472 substituted. S.J. 865. | |
2012-04-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 861. | |
2012-04-23 | Subcommittee, Hogg, Bolkcom, and Feenstra. S.J. 846. | |
2012-04-19 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 834. |