IA SF2338 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed by Governor. S.J. 954.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed by Governor. S.J. 954.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to government operations and efficiency and other related matters and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3176 and SF 2299.) Vetoed 5-25-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to government operations and efficiency and other related matters and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3176 and SF 2299.) Vetoed 5-25-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Vetoed by Governor. S.J. 954. | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 946. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 946. | |
2012-04-25 | Message from House. S.J. 859. | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 889. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 888. | |
2012-04-25 | Point ruled not well taken. H.J. 888. | |
2012-04-25 | Point of order raised Rule 10. H.J. 888. | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment H-8508 withdrawn. H.J. 888. | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 888. | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-8511. H.J. 887. | |
2012-04-25 | Ruled not germane H-8511. H.J. 887. | |
2012-04-25 | Point of order raised H-8511 not germane. H.J. 887. | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment H-8511 filed. H.J. 886. | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 886. | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-8510. H.J. 886. | |
2012-04-25 | Ruled not germane H-8510. H.J. 885. | |
2012-04-25 | Point of order raised H-8510 not germane. H.J. 885. | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment H-8510 filed. H.J. 885. | |
2012-04-25 | Ruled not germane H-8507. H.J. 885. | |
2012-04-25 | Point of order raised H-8507 not germane. H.J. 885. | |
2012-04-25 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 882. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendments H-8507 and H-8508 filed. H.J. 880. | |
2012-04-24 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 879. | |
2012-04-24 | Subcommittee, Cownie, Quirk, and Vander Linden. H.J. 879. | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 878. | |
2012-04-23 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 864. | |
2012-04-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 864. | |
2012-04-19 | Immediate message. S.J. 833. | |
2012-04-19 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 832. | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment S-5224 filed, lost. S.J. 831. | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment S-5226 filed, adopted. S.J. 831. | |
2012-04-19 | Deferred. S.J. 827. | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment S-5223 filed, adopted. S.J. 827. | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment S-5222 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 827. | |
2012-04-18 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 824. | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 824. |