IA SF2337 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers and test examiners for commercial driver's license knowledge and driving skills tests. (Formerly SSB 3132.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers and test examiners for commercial driver's license knowledge and driving skills tests. (Formerly SSB 3132.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 942. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 941. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 498. |
2022-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 542. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 538. |
2022-03-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2530. H.J. 538. |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 394. |
2022-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 351. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 377. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 377. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 333. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 319. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3132 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2337.