IA SF2334 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 860.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 860.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of hospitals, including the issuance of licenses and the conversion of hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3128.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of hospitals, including the issuance of licenses and the conversion of hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3128.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 860. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 844. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 742. |
2018-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 649. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 636. |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 448. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Brown-Powers and Jacobsen. H.J. 430. |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 398. |
2018-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 394. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 439. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 439. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 359. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3128 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.