IA SF2334 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 934.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 934.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the commission of veterans affairs for the provision of veterans services, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3127 and SF 2138.)
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the commission of veterans affairs for the provision of veterans services, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3127 and SF 2138.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Withdrawn. S.J. 934. | |
2012-05-09 | House File 2466 substituted. S.J. 933. | |
2012-05-09 | Amendment S-5213 adopted. S.J. 932. | |
2012-05-09 | Amendment S-5259 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 932. | |
2012-05-09 | Amendment S-5198 withdrawn. S.J. 932. | |
2012-04-16 | Amendment S-5213 filed. S.J. 807. | |
2012-04-16 | Deferred. S.J. 799. | |
2012-04-11 | Amendment S-5198 filed. S.J. 779. | |
2012-04-11 | Deferred. S.J. 768. | |
2012-04-09 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 752. | |
2012-04-09 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 751. |