IA SF233 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding driving privileges of persons issued a special minor's driver's license who attend a public school, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 67.)
Title
A bill for an act regarding driving privileges of persons issued a special minor's driver's license who attend a public school, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 67.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Driscoll, and T. Taylor. S.J. 98. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 255. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
SF67 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 233. S.J. 255.