IA SF233 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Lykam, and Sinclair. S.J. 288.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Lykam, and Sinclair. S.J. 288.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to customer choice regarding the installation of certain public utility meters.
Title
A bill for an act relating to customer choice regarding the installation of certain public utility meters.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Lykam, and Sinclair. S.J. 288. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 269. |
Same As/Similar To
HF154 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 3:30PM RM 15.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF233 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF233.html |