IA SF233 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to payment for behavioral health services provided by licensed mental health counselors and certified alcohol and drug counselors under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SF 152.) Effective 7-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to payment for behavioral health services provided by licensed mental health counselors and certified alcohol and drug counselors under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SF 152.) Effective 7-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 939. | |
2011-04-04 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 878. | |
2011-04-04 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 878. | |
2011-03-29 | Message from Senate. H.J. 834. | |
2011-03-29 | Immediate message. S.J. 828. | |
2011-03-29 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 828. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate concurred with S-3173. S.J. 827. | |
2011-03-24 | Message from House, with amendment S-3173. S.J. 793. | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate message. H.J. 789. | |
2011-03-23 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 788. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1396 adopted. H.J. 788. | |
2011-03-23 | Substituted for HF 497. H.J. 787. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed on file. H.J. 770. | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment H-1396 filed. H.J. 742. | |
2011-03-04 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 533. | |
2011-03-01 | Message from Senate. H.J. 458. | |
2011-03-01 | Immediate message. S.J. 435. | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 430. | |
2011-02-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 312. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 308. |