IA SF2329 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 823.
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 823.
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an Iowa communications network advisory committee. (Formerly SSB 3174.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing an Iowa communications network advisory committee. (Formerly SSB 3174.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 823. | |
2010-03-03 | Subcommittee, Lensing, Pettengill, and Taylor. H.J. 815. | |
2010-03-02 | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 791. | |
2010-03-02 | Message from Senate. H.J. 790. | |
2010-03-02 | Immediate message. S.J. 627. | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate, ayes 34, nays 16. S.J. 626. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendment S-5085 adopted. S.J. 626. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendment S-5073 withdrawn. S.J. 626. | |
2010-02-17 | Amendment S-5085 filed. S.J. 470. | |
2010-02-16 | Amendment S-5073 filed. S.J. 450. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 380. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 367. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0892B&ga=83 |