IA SF2328 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal law including the disclosure of a defendant's privileged records in a criminal action, no-contact orders, penalties for domestic abuse assault, limitations on criminal actions involving certain sexual offenses, criminal sentencing and corrections, parole and work release, crime victim rights, discovery in criminal actions, postconviction relief procedure, certain reporting requirements, conditional guilty pleas, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2226.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal law including the disclosure of a defendant's privileged records in a criminal action, no-contact orders, penalties for domestic abuse assault, limitations on criminal actions involving certain sexual offenses, criminal sentencing and corrections, parole and work release, crime victim rights, discovery in criminal actions, postconviction relief procedure, certain reporting requirements, conditional guilty pleas, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2226.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5052 be adopted? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5052 be adopted? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 547. |
2022-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 545. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 498. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 35, nays 10. S.J. 497. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5054 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 497. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendments S-5048 and S-5050 out of order. S.J. 497. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5052 adopted, as amended. S.J. 496. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5058 to S-5052 filed, adopted. S.J. 496. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5052 filed. S.J. 496. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendments S-5048 and S-5050 filed. S.J. 487. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 475. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 327. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 318. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2226 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2328. S.J. 327.