IA SF2328 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 885.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 885.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the technical administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration of income taxes, sales and use taxes, franchise fees, notification of annexation or severance by cities, and cigarette and tobacco taxes, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3131.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the technical administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration of income taxes, sales and use taxes, franchise fees, notification of annexation or severance by cities, and cigarette and tobacco taxes, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3131.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 885. | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 868. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 868. | |
2012-04-17 | Message from House. S.J. 813. | |
2012-04-17 | Immediate message. H.J. 828. | |
2012-04-17 | Passed House, ayes 75, nays 24. H.J. 827. | |
2012-04-16 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-04-12 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 811. | |
2012-04-10 | Subcommittee, Helland, Kaufmann, and Quirk. H.J. 793. | |
2012-04-05 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 759. | |
2012-04-05 | Message from Senate. H.J. 759. | |
2012-04-04 | Immediate message. S.J. 736. | |
2012-04-04 | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 1. S.J. 734. | |
2012-04-02 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 699. | |
2012-04-02 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 698. |