IA SF2326 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Rereferred to Ways & Means. H.J. 941.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Rereferred to Ways & Means. H.J. 941.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to qualification for and receipt of the wind energy and renewable energy tax credits. (Formerly SF 2050.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to qualification for and receipt of the wind energy and renewable energy tax credits. (Formerly SF 2050.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Rereferred to Ways & Means. H.J. 941. | |
2012-04-18 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-04-10 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 778. | |
2012-04-10 | Message from Senate. H.J. 777. | |
2012-04-10 | Immediate message. S.J. 758. | |
2012-04-10 | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 9. S.J. 758. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5189 ruled out of order. S.J. 757. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5184 ruled out of order. S.J. 757. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5192 filed, adopted. S.J. 757. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5188 lost. S.J. 757. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5187 withdrawn. S.J. 757. | |
2012-04-09 | Amendments S-5184, S-5187, S-5188, and S-5189 filed. S.J. 753. | |
2012-04-02 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-03-29 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 693. | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 692. |