IA SF2323 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the funding of, the operation of, and appropriation of moneys to the college student aid commission, the department for the blind, the department of education, and the state board of regents, providing for related matters, and including effective and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3185.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the funding of, the operation of, and appropriation of moneys to the college student aid commission, the department for the blind, the department of education, and the state board of regents, providing for related matters, and including effective and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3185.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 762. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 792. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 22. S.J. 791. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5161. S.J. 790. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5161. S.J. 764. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 52, nays 41. H.J. 716. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8273 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8269 to amendment H-8262 filed, out of order. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8262 withdrawn. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8257 as amended, adopted. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8272 to amendment H-8257 filed, adopted. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendments H-8261 and H-8263 withdrawn. H.J. 714. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8271 lost. H.J. 714. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8271 filed. H.J. 713. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8270 filed, lost. H.J. 713. |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment H-8260 adopted. H.J. 712. |
2016-04-21 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 711. |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendments H-8257, H-8260, H-8261, H-8262, and H-8263 filed. H.J. 702. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 702. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-20 | House | Subcommittee, Dolecheck, Mascher, and Sexton. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 674. |
2016-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 673. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 735. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 733. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5144 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 733. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5139 filed, lost. S.J. 733. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5145 filed, adopted. S.J. 732. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5138 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 732. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5140 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 736. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5137 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 732. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 722. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 720. |