IA SF2322 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system. (Formerly SSB 3186.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system. (Formerly SSB 3186.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 773. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | HF 2458 substituted. S.J. 756. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 adopted. S.J. 756. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 filed. S.J. 753. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 721. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 720. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF2322 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2322.html |