IA SF2321 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 720.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 720.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to jurisdiction over certain offenses committed by members of the state military forces, and establishing certain notification and reporting requirements. (Formerly SF 2111.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to jurisdiction over certain offenses committed by members of the state military forces, and establishing certain notification and reporting requirements. (Formerly SF 2111.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 720. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 640. |
2014-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 584. |
2014-03-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 601. |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 578. |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 502. |
2014-03-11 | House | Subcommittee, Gustafson, Alons, Gaines, Shaw, and Thomas. H.J. 477. |
2014-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 472. |
2014-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 471. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 511. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 511. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5051 filed, adopted. S.J. 510. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, without recommendation. S.J. 366. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 347. |