IA SF2315 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the review and permitting of sewer extensions and water supply distribution system extensions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3166.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the review and permitting of sewer extensions and water supply distribution system extensions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3166.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 597. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | HF 2475 substituted. S.J. 596. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2475. S.J. 526. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 361. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 350. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB636 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 297.
SSB3166 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315.
HF2475 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
SSB3166 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315.
HF2475 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2315 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2315.html |