IA SF2313 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to employment services programs administered by the department of workforce development by providing for conformity with federal law concerning the workforce development board, authorizing the department to carry out certain actions relating to the unemployment insurance program, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3176.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to employment services programs administered by the department of workforce development by providing for conformity with federal law concerning the workforce development board, authorizing the department to carry out certain actions relating to the unemployment insurance program, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3176.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 783. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 742. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 1. H.J. 741. |
2016-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 741. |
2016-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8284. H.J. 740. |
2016-04-25 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8284. H.J. 740. |
2016-04-25 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8284 not germane. H.J. 740. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8284 filed. H.J. 740. |
2016-04-25 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 740. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 723. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee, Deyoe, Running-Marquardt, and R. Taylor. H.J. 685. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 667. |
2016-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 662. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 715. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 713. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5130 filed, adopted. S.J. 712. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 705. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 704. |