IA SF2311 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the department of public defense by providing for the gold star military museum. (Formerly SSB 3041 and SF 2073.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the department of public defense by providing for the gold star military museum. (Formerly SSB 3041 and SF 2073.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 783. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 742. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 739. |
2016-04-25 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 738. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 723. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-20 | House | Subcommittee, Fisher, Bacon, and Bearinger. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 674. |
2016-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 662. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 718. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 716. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 683. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 683. |