IA SF2310 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to educational instructional requirements and funding flexibility and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2004.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to educational instructional requirements and funding flexibility and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2004.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 864.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862.
2020-06-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 834.
2020-06-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 764.
2020-06-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-13HousePassed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 758.
2020-06-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8313. H.J. 757.
2020-06-13HouseSenate amendment H-8313 filed. H.J. 757.
2020-06-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 756.
2020-06-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 811.
2020-06-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 810.
2020-06-13SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-13SenateSenate concurred with S-5135, as amended. S.J. 810.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5154 to S-5135 filed, adopted. S.J. 810.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5149 to S-5135 withdrawn. S.J. 810.
2020-06-12SenateAmendment S-5149 to S-5135 filed. S.J. 802.
2020-06-11SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-10SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5135. S.J. 752.
2020-06-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2020-06-10HousePassed House, yeas 92, nays 6. H.J. 688.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8240 adopted, as amended. H.J. 687.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8245 to amendment H-8240 filed, adopted. H.J. 687.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8252 to amendment H-8240 filed, adopted. H.J. 687.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8247 to amendment H-8240 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 687.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8246 withdrawn. H.J. 687.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8175 withdrawn. H.J. 687.
2020-06-05HouseAmendment H-8240 filed. H.J. 665.
2020-06-03HouseCommittee amendment H-8175 filed. H.J. 632.
2020-06-03HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 631.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
2020-03-09HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2020 1:30PM House Lounge.
2020-03-04HouseSubcommittee: Moore, T., Gassman and Kurth. H.J. 487.
2020-03-03HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 420.
2020-03-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 409.
2020-02-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 461.
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 460.
2020-02-27SenateAmendment S-5035 filed, adopted. S.J. 460.
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 338.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 335.

Same As/Similar To

SF2004 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310. S.J. 338.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback