IA SF231 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for unified fire and emergency service departments.
Title
A bill for an act providing for unified fire and emergency service departments.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 10:00AM RM 315. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Segebart, and J. Smith. S.J. 288. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 269. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF231 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF231.html |