IA SF230 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to manufacturers of alcoholic beverages. (Formerly SSB 1021.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to manufacturers of alcoholic beverages. (Formerly SSB 1021.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 860. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 961. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 954. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3116. S.J. 954. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3116. S.J. 855. |
2019-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 2. H.J. 735. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee amendment H-1047 adopted. H.J. 735. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee amendment H-1047 filed. H.J. 586. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 585. |
2019-03-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee: Carlson, Best and Hall. H.J. 524. |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 311. |
2019-02-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 309. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 321. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 393. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 2. S.J. 319. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 275. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 269. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1021 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.