IA SF2299 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the early childhood Iowa initiative. (Formerly SSB 3128.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the early childhood Iowa initiative. (Formerly SSB 3128.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 811. |
2016-04-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 779. |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 778. |
2016-04-28 | House | Amendment H-8296 to amendment H-8294 out of order. H.J. 778. |
2016-04-28 | House | Amendment H-8294 withdrawn. H.J. 778. |
2016-04-28 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 778. |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment H-8296 filed. H.J. 759. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8294 filed. H.J. 754. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 723. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee, Heaton, Dolecheck, and Mascher. H.J. 685. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 644. |
2016-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 640. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 692. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 681. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5123 filed, adopted. S.J. 681. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 470. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 438. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 435. |