IA SF2299 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 936.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 936.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to grain transactions by regulating grain dealers and warehouse operators, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3193.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to grain transactions by regulating grain dealers and warehouse operators, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3193.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 936. | |
2010-03-19 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 913. | |
2010-03-19 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 913. | |
2010-02-22 | Message from House. S.J. 522. | |
2010-02-22 | Immediate message. H.J. 647. | |
2010-02-22 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 635. | |
2010-02-22 | Substituted for HF 2435. H.J. 635. | |
2010-02-19 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 623. | |
2010-02-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 614. | |
2010-02-18 | Immediate message. S.J. 481. | |
2010-02-24 | Explanation of vote. S.J. 578. | |
2010-02-18 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 479. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 371. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 362. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0862B&ga=83 |