IA SF2296 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding persons who are deemed independent contractors when performing services while operating certain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 3144.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act regarding persons who are deemed independent contractors when performing services while operating certain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 3144.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 863. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 663. |
2020-06-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 625. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 51, nays 46. H.J. 619. |
2020-06-03 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 618. |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment H-8110 lost. H.J. 618. |
2020-06-03 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 617. |
2020-06-03 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8138. H.J. 616. |
2020-06-03 | House | Point of order raised on H-8138, ruled not germane. H.J. 616. |
2020-06-03 | House | Substituted for HF 2479. H.J. 616. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8138 filed. H.J. 569. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8110 filed. H.J. 534. |
2020-02-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 356. |
2020-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 338. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 388. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 387. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5011 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 386. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 343. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 333. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3144 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296.
HSB665 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 313.
HF2479 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.
HSB665 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 313.
HF2479 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.