IA SF2293 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including provisions concerning record retention at established places of business of motor vehicle dealers, electronic titling and registration of motor vehicles, and warranties and recalls of motor vehicle franchises. (Formerly SSB 3170.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including provisions concerning record retention at established places of business of motor vehicle dealers, electronic titling and registration of motor vehicles, and warranties and recalls of motor vehicle franchises. (Formerly SSB 3170.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 902. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 901. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 757. |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 658. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 590. |
2018-03-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Hager and Heddens. H.J. 549. |
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 495. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 490. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 564. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 560. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5098 filed, adopted. S.J. 560. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 322. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 317. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3170 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.