IA SF2293 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Senate amendment H-8512 filed. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Senate amendment H-8512 filed. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the insurance division of the department of commerce, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3066.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the insurance division of the department of commerce, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3066.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate amendment H-8512 filed. H.J. 897. | |
2012-05-01 | Message from Senate. H.J. 896. | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate message. S.J. 879. | |
2012-05-01 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 879. | |
2012-05-01 | Senate concurred with S-5183, as amended. S.J. 879. | |
2012-05-01 | Amendment S-5237 adopted. S.J. 878. | |
2012-04-26 | Amendment S-5237 filed. S.J. 867. | |
2012-04-05 | Message from House, with amendment S-5183. S.J. 739. | |
2012-04-04 | Immediate message. H.J. 753. | |
2012-04-04 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. | |
2012-04-04 | Passed House, ayes 66, nays 29. H.J. 752. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8414 adopted. H.J. 752. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8417 lost. H.J. 751. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8417 filed. H.J. 750. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8412 adopted. H.J. 750. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8415 filed, adopted. H.J. 749. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendments H-8315 and H-8312 withdrawn. H.J. 749. | |
2012-04-04 | Substituted for HF 2339. H.J. 749. | |
2012-04-03 | Amendments H-8412 and H-8414 filed. H.J. 733. | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 631. | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment H-8312 filed. H.J. 614. | |
2012-03-13 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 559. | |
2012-03-13 | Message from Senate. H.J. 554. | |
2012-03-13 | Immediate message. S.J. 538. | |
2012-03-13 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 537. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendment S-5066C adopted. S.J. 536. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendment S-5066B adopted. S.J. 536. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendment S-5066A withdrawn. S.J. 535. | |
2012-03-13 | Motion to reconsider vote on S-5066 filed, prevailed. S.J. 535. | |
2012-03-13 | Motion to reconsider vote on bill filed, prevailed. S.J. 534. | |
2012-03-13 | Failed to pass Senate, ayes 23, nays 27. S.J. 531. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendments S-5033 and S-5048 out of order. S.J. 531. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendment S-5066 adopted. S.J. 531. | |
2012-03-13 | Amendment S-5049 lost. S.J. 530. | |
2012-03-12 | Amendment S-5066 filed. S.J. 520. | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment S-5049 filed. S.J. 501. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment S-5048 filed. S.J. 481. | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment S-5033 filed. S.J. 401. | |
2012-02-27 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 364. | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 360. |