IA SF2292 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to application of specific penalties to an assault on a social worker under certain circumstances.(Formerly SF 2159.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to application of specific penalties to an assault on a social worker under certain circumstances.(Formerly SF 2159.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 307. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 302. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2094 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 122.
SF2159 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292. S.J. 307.
SF2159 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292. S.J. 307.