IA SF2290 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to identification required for operation of a railroad train. (Formerly SF 2135.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to identification required for operation of a railroad train. (Formerly SF 2135.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 651. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 610. |
2014-03-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 532. |
2014-03-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 549. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 528. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 490. |
2014-03-04 | House | Subcommittee, Landon, Heartsill, and Riding. H.J. 417. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 385. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 382. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 441. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 436. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 365. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 343. |