IA SF2284 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 438.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act modifying the elements defining hate crimes, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2120.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act modifying the elements defining hate crimes, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2120.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-09HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 438.
2016-03-08HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 431.
2016-03-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 451.
2016-03-08SenatePassed Senate, ayes 27, nays 21. S.J. 450.
2016-03-08SenatePoint of order raised on S-5035, ruled out of order. S.J. 449.
2016-03-08SenateAmendment S-5031 withdrawn. S.J. 449.
2016-03-08SenateAmendment S-5036 lost. S.J. 449.
2016-02-25SenateAmendment S-5036 filed. S.J. 373.
2016-02-25SenateAmendment S-5035 filed. S.J. 373.
2016-02-25SenateAmendment S-5031 filed. S.J. 373.
2016-02-25SenateDeferred. S.J. 369.
2016-02-22SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 312.
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 308.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback