IA SF2283 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various recreation and conservation activities under the purview of the department of natural resources, providing for repeals, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3052.) Various effective dates; see section 21 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to various recreation and conservation activities under the purview of the department of natural resources, providing for repeals, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3052.) Various effective dates; see section 21 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 949. | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 946. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 946. | |
2012-04-17 | Message from House. S.J. 812. | |
2012-04-17 | Immediate message. H.J. 828. | |
2012-04-17 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 826. | |
2012-04-17 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8456. H.J. 825. | |
2012-04-16 | Senate amendment H-8456 filed. H.J. 818. | |
2012-04-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 816. | |
2012-04-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 799. | |
2012-04-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 797. | |
2012-04-16 | Senate concurred with S-5062, as amended. S.J. 797. | |
2012-04-16 | Amendment S-5211 adopted. S.J. 797. | |
2012-04-12 | Amendment S-5211 filed. S.J. 795. | |
2012-03-12 | Message from House, with amendment S-5062. S.J. 507. | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate message. H.J. 489. | |
2012-03-08 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 488. | |
2012-03-08 | Amendments H-8129 and H-8134 adopted. H.J. 488. | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment H-8113 lost. H.J. 488. | |
2012-03-08 | Substituted for HF 2409. H.J. 487. | |
2012-03-07 | Amendments H-8129 and H-8134 filed. H.J. 478. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment H-8113 filed. H.J. 460. | |
2012-03-06 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 420. | |
2012-03-06 | Message from Senate. H.J. 417. | |
2012-03-05 | Immediate message. S.J. 440. | |
2012-03-05 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 438. | |
2012-02-27 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 368. | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 358. |