IA SF2282 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 492.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 492.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the constitutionality of statutes and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2153.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the constitutionality of statutes and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2153.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 492. |
2018-03-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 474. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 543. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 543. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 320. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 316. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2106 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 147.
SF2153 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2153 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.