IA SF2281 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 492.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 492.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prerequisites for and prohibition against an abortion related to the testing for, and following the detection of, a fetal heartbeat, providing for a repeal, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3143.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prerequisites for and prohibition against an abortion related to the testing for, and following the detection of, a fetal heartbeat, providing for a repeal, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3143.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 492. |
2018-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 432. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 492. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20. S.J. 488. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amendment S-5067 filed, adopted. S.J. 488. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 320. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 315. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3143 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.