IA SF2274 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 888.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 888.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the department of education to include references to state or federal statutory or regulatory provisions necessitating the inclusion of information in reports filed with the department. (Formerly SSB 3001.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the department of education to include references to state or federal statutory or regulatory provisions necessitating the inclusion of information in reports filed with the department. (Formerly SSB 3001.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 888. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 888. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 728. |
2018-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 630. |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 5. H.J. 622. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 443. |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Jones and Staed. H.J. 394. |
2018-02-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 356. |
2018-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 330. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 391. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 37, nays 11. S.J. 388. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3001 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.