IA SF2272 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to community college accreditation. (Formerly SSB 3088.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to community college accreditation. (Formerly SSB 3088.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Hanusa, Breckenridge and Wheeler. H.J. 430. |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 423. |
2018-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 407. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 468. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20. S.J. 467. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5040 adopted. S.J. 467. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 449. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5040 filed. S.J. 446. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2071 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3088 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3088 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.