IA SF227 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 848.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 848.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the school start date and to exception and penalty provisions and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1058.) Effective 4-10-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the school start date and to exception and penalty provisions and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1058.) Effective 4-10-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 848. |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 806. |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 806. |
2015-04-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 736. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 744. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motions to reconsider vote withdrawn. S.J. 744. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on S-3068. S.J. 715. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on bill. S.J. 715. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 22. S.J. 704. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3068. S.J. 703. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Message from House, with Amendment S-3068. S.J. 687. |
2015-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 683. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed House, ayes 71, nays 29. H.J. 681. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1091 withdrawn. H.J. 681. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1137 as amended, adopted. H.J. 681. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1141 filed, out of order. H.J. 680. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1140 to amendment H-1137 filed, adopted. H.J. 680. |
2015-03-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 680. |
2015-03-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1139. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-24 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1139. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-24 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1139 not germane. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1139 to amendment H-1137 filed. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1087 withdrawn. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-24 | House | Substituted for HF 307. H.J. 679. |
2015-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1137 filed. H.J. 669. |
2015-03-16 | House | Amendments H-1087 and H-1091 filed. H.J. 585. |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 582. |
2015-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 538. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 539. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 17. S.J. 538. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3025, ruled out of order. S.J. 538. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3025 filed. S.J. 538. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3028 filed, lost. S.J. 537. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3027, ruled out of order. S.J. 537. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3027 filed. S.J. 537. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3005 withdrawn. S.J. 537. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3005 filed. S.J. 338. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 294. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 292. |