IA SF2264 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to guardians ad litem, attorneys for minor children, child custody investigators, and child and family reporters involved in child custody and visitation proceedings. (Formerly SSB 3103.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to guardians ad litem, attorneys for minor children, child custody investigators, and child and family reporters involved in child custody and visitation proceedings. (Formerly SSB 3103.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-03-08 | House | Subcommittee, Branhagen, Jones, and Prichard. H.J. 436. |
2016-03-01 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 355. |
2016-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 352. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 381. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 380. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 284. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 280. |