IA SF2259 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to personal information security breach notification requirements, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3040.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to personal information security breach notification requirements, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3040.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 587. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 647. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 644. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5081. S.J. 644. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5081. S.J. 611. |
2014-03-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 532. |
2014-03-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 549. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 526. |
2014-03-18 | House | Committee amendment H-8110 adopted. H.J. 525. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee amendment H-8110 filed. H.J. 490. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 489. |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee, Klein, Anderson, and Fry. H.J. 371. |
2014-02-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 355. |
2014-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 350. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 404. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 400. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5018 adopted. S.J. 400. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5018 filed. S.J. 394. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |