IA SF2251 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to specialty areas, service commitment area distance requirements, and practice-related requirements under the rural Iowa primary care loan repayment program. (Formerly SSB 3079.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to specialty areas, service commitment area distance requirements, and practice-related requirements under the rural Iowa primary care loan repayment program. (Formerly SSB 3079.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-03-04 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Dolecheck and Steckman. H.J. 486. |
2020-03-03 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 419. |
2020-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 396. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 445. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 442. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 308. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 301. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3079 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2251.