IA SF2251 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of anhydrous ammonia and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2135.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of anhydrous ammonia and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2135.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Klein, Bearinger, and Holz. H.J. 416. |
2016-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 379. |
2016-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 375. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 404. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 404. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5040 adopted. S.J. 403. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5040 filed. S.J. 399. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 281. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 277. |