IA SF2248 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 450.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 450.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, providing fees, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3110.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, providing fees, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3110.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 450. |
2016-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 438. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 461. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 1. S.J. 461. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5064 withdrawn. S.J. 461. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5060 adopted. S.J. 460. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5064 filed. S.J. 457. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 455. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5060 filed. S.J. 455. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 274. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 270. |